THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:07:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 B Victoria Street South
The Centre for Family Medicine
Integrated Health Building Site
Kitchener ON N2G 1C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 783-0021
Fax: (519) 783-0031
Address: Sunnyside Home LTC
247 Franklin Street North
Kitchener, ON
N2A 1Y5
Kitchener Ontario N2A 1Y5
Phone: (519) 893-8494
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 650 Mountain Maple Avenue
Extendicare Columbia Forest Long-Term Care
Waterloo Ontario N2V 2P7
Phone: 519-884-4480
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patricia S. Froese Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Froese (CPSO#: 102953 )
Business Address: 247 Franklin Street North
Kitchener Ontario N2A 1Y5
(519) 893-8492
Business Address: 10 Victoria St S
The Centre for Family Medicine
Unit B
Kitchener ON N2G 1C5
5197830021
Business Address: 650 Mountain Maple Ave
Columbia Forest Long Term Care Home
Dixon House
Waterloo ON N2V 2P7
(519) 884-4480

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 B Victoria Street South
The Centre for Family Medicine
Integrated Health Building Site
Kitchener ON N2G 1C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 783-0021
Fax: (519) 783-0031
Address: Sunnyside Home LTC
247 Franklin Street North
Kitchener, ON
N2A 1Y5
Kitchener Ontario N2A 1Y5
Phone: (519) 893-8494
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 650 Mountain Maple Avenue
Extendicare Columbia Forest Long-Term Care
Waterloo Ontario N2V 2P7
Phone: 519-884-4480
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patricia S. Froese Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Froese (CPSO#: 102953 )
Business Address: 247 Franklin Street North
Kitchener Ontario N2A 1Y5
(519) 893-8492
Business Address: 10 Victoria St S
The Centre for Family Medicine
Unit B
Kitchener ON N2G 1C5
5197830021
Business Address: 650 Mountain Maple Ave
Columbia Forest Long Term Care Home
Dixon House
Waterloo ON N2V 2P7
(519) 884-4480

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICIA SHIRLEY FROESE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FROESE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICIA SHIRLEY FROESE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FROESE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014