THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:35:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main St W
McMaster University Medical Centre
The Boris Clinic
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 76061
Fax: (905) 521-2653
Address: 2757 King St E
Hamilton ON L8G 5E4
Phone: 905-573-4819
Fax: 905-573-4843

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Medina Mohamed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mohamed (CPSO#: 102959 )
Business Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
The Boris Clinic
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
905-521-2100 Extn: 76061
Business Address: 305-2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
(905) 662-3303
Business Address: 2C-35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
(905) 662-3303

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main St W
McMaster University Medical Centre
The Boris Clinic
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 76061
Fax: (905) 521-2653
Address: 2757 King St E
Hamilton ON L8G 5E4
Phone: 905-573-4819
Fax: 905-573-4843

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Medina Mohamed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mohamed (CPSO#: 102959 )
Business Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
The Boris Clinic
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
905-521-2100 Extn: 76061
Business Address: 305-2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
(905) 662-3303
Business Address: 2C-35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
(905) 662-3303

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEDINA YASSIN MOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEDINA YASSIN MOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014