THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 12:06:47 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 209
4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 3S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 631-6090
Fax: (416) 631-6535

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Justin Shamis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shamis (CPSO#: 102964 )
Business Address: 209-4430 Bathurst St
North York ON M3H 3S3
Business Address: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
North York ON M2K 1E1
Business Address: 555 Finch Ave W
North York General Hospital, Branson Site
North York ON M2R 1N5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 209
4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 3S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 631-6090
Fax: (416) 631-6535

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital Branson Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Justin Shamis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shamis (CPSO#: 102964 )
Business Address: 209-4430 Bathurst St
North York ON M3H 3S3
Business Address: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
North York ON M2K 1E1
Business Address: 555 Finch Ave W
North York General Hospital, Branson Site
North York ON M2R 1N5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN ALEXANDER SHAMIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN ALEXANDER SHAMIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014