THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:30:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network - Centenary Hospital
Division of Cardiology
Room 2092
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 325 Milner Ave
Corcare
Suite 410
Scarborough ON M1B 5N1
Phone: 416-284-4744
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bradley Sarak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sarak (CPSO#: 102971 )
Business Address: 410-325 Milner Ave
Scarborough ON M1B 5N1
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network - Centenary Hospital
Division of Cardiology
Room 2092
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 325 Milner Ave
Corcare
Suite 410
Scarborough ON M1B 5N1
Phone: 416-284-4744
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bradley Sarak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sarak (CPSO#: 102971 )
Business Address: 410-325 Milner Ave
Scarborough ON M1B 5N1
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRADLEY DEAN SARAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRADLEY DEAN SARAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014