THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:35:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Georgina Family Health
234 Dovedale Drive
Keswick Ontario L4P 0H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 476 3775
Fax: 905 476 3778
Address: 205-531 Davis Drive
Clinic
Genesis Professional Group
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 6P5
Phone: 2892789112
Fax: 8668996373

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samantha Matin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Matin (CPSO#: 102980 )
Business Address: Georgina Family Health
234 Dovedale Drive
Keswick Ontario L4P 0H3
(905) 476-3775

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Georgina Family Health
234 Dovedale Drive
Keswick Ontario L4P 0H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 476 3775
Fax: 905 476 3778
Address: 205-531 Davis Drive
Clinic
Genesis Professional Group
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 6P5
Phone: 2892789112
Fax: 8668996373

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samantha Matin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Matin (CPSO#: 102980 )
Business Address: Georgina Family Health
234 Dovedale Drive
Keswick Ontario L4P 0H3
(905) 476-3775

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA ANNE MATIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMANTHA ANNE MATIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014