THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:13:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-1661
Extension: 52289
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.P. Meyer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Meyer (CPSO#: 102987 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-1661
Extension: 52289
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.P. Meyer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Meyer (CPSO#: 102987 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABRAHAM PHILLIP MEYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEYER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABRAHAM PHILLIP MEYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEYER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 2014
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 May 2014