THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:24:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: Emond, Julie Helene (Used Until: 02 Dec 2015)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4512 Ste-Catherine Street
St-Isidore Medical
Unit B
Saint Isidore Ontario K0C 2B0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-524-3225
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie Koncan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Koncan (CPSO#: 102994 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: Centre M‚dical St-Isidore
4553 rue Ste-Catherine
St. Isidore Ontario K0C 2B0
(613) 524-3225

General Information

Former Name: Emond, Julie Helene (Used Until: 02 Dec 2015)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4512 Ste-Catherine Street
St-Isidore Medical
Unit B
Saint Isidore Ontario K0C 2B0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-524-3225
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie Koncan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Koncan (CPSO#: 102994 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: Centre M‚dical St-Isidore
4553 rue Ste-Catherine
St. Isidore Ontario K0C 2B0
(613) 524-3225

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE HELENE KONCAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONCAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE HELENE KONCAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONCAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014