THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:51:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Monfort Hospital
Emergency Department
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rohit Gandhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gandhi (CPSO#: 102996 )
Business Address: 55 Hyannis Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2J 2W9
6138522220

Corporation Name: Rohit Gandhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Monfort Hospital
Emergency Department
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rohit Gandhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gandhi (CPSO#: 102996 )
Business Address: 55 Hyannis Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2J 2W9
6138522220

Corporation Name: Rohit Gandhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROHIT GANDHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROHIT GANDHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014