THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:22:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 876 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-742-8182
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McKay Veilleux Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McKay (CPSO#: 102997 ) Dr. M. Veilleux (CPSO#: 102972 )
Business Address: E-876 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L3
(613) 742-8182
Business Address: Orleans Family Health Clinic
110-210 Centrum Boulevard
Ottawa Ontario K1C 1T1
(613) 837-5454

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 876 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-742-8182
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McKay Veilleux Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McKay (CPSO#: 102997 ) Dr. M. Veilleux (CPSO#: 102972 )
Business Address: E-876 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L3
(613) 742-8182
Business Address: Orleans Family Health Clinic
110-210 Centrum Boulevard
Ottawa Ontario K1C 1T1
(613) 837-5454

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTINE ISABELLE MCKAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTINE ISABELLE MCKAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014