THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:25:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 783-0023
Fax: 519-783-0033

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Apr 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 17 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. J. MCLEOD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. McLeod (CPSO#: 103002 )
Business Address: B1-10 Victoria St S
Kitchener ON N2G 1C5
519-783-0023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 783-0023
Fax: 519-783-0033

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Apr 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 17 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. J. MCLEOD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. McLeod (CPSO#: 103002 )
Business Address: B1-10 Victoria St S
Kitchener ON N2G 1C5
519-783-0023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDACHE ROBYN MCLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEOD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDACHE ROBYN MCLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEOD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014