THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:49:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bayview Village Shopping Centre
2877 Bayview Ave
PO Box 91130
Toronto Ontario M2K 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 223-4141
Fax: (416) 491-6428
Address: 89 Queensway W
Rivlin Medical Group
Suite 601
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
Phone: 905-281-9898
Fax: 905-281-9143
Address: 1324 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 1M9
Phone: (416) 849-2230
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 601
89 Queensway W
Toronto Ontario L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 281-9898
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 790 Bay St
Immigration Medical Toronto
Unit 716
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Phone: 4164632438
Fax: 4164632526

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chan (CPSO#: 103010 )
Business Address: 2901 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2K 2Y6
(416) 223-4141
Business Address: 89 Queensway W
Rivlin Medical Group
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bayview Village Shopping Centre
2877 Bayview Ave
PO Box 91130
Toronto Ontario M2K 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 223-4141
Fax: (416) 491-6428
Address: 89 Queensway W
Rivlin Medical Group
Suite 601
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
Phone: 905-281-9898
Fax: 905-281-9143
Address: 1324 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 1M9
Phone: (416) 849-2230
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 601
89 Queensway W
Toronto Ontario L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 281-9898
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 790 Bay St
Immigration Medical Toronto
Unit 716
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Phone: 4164632438
Fax: 4164632526

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chan (CPSO#: 103010 )
Business Address: 2901 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2K 2Y6
(416) 223-4141
Business Address: 89 Queensway W
Rivlin Medical Group
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CINDY DE JING CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CINDY DE JING CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014