THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:57:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St-Joseph Family Medicine Clinic
104-2555 St Joseph Blvd
Orléans Ontario K1C 1S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 830-1298
Fax: (613) 830-2170
Address: Montfort Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Chartrand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chartrand (CPSO#: 103013 )
Business Address: St. Joseph Family Medicine Clinic
2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Suite 104
Orléans Ontario K1C 1S6
(613) 830-1298
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 748-4929

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St-Joseph Family Medicine Clinic
104-2555 St Joseph Blvd
Orléans Ontario K1C 1S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 830-1298
Fax: (613) 830-2170
Address: Montfort Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Chartrand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chartrand (CPSO#: 103013 )
Business Address: St. Joseph Family Medicine Clinic
2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Suite 104
Orléans Ontario K1C 1S6
(613) 830-1298
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 748-4929

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE ELISE CHARTRAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARTRAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE ELISE CHARTRAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARTRAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014