THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:53:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Huron Shores Family Health Team
527 Causley Street
P.O. Box 1450
Blind River Ontario P0R 1B0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 356-1666
Extension: 251
Fax: (705) 356-2403

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 04 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Shore Health Network Blind River
HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Naccarato Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Naccarato (CPSO#: 103014 )
Business Address: P.O. Box 970
525 Causley Street
Blind River Ontario P0R 1B0
Business Address: Huron Shores Family Health Team
P.O. Box 1450
527 Causley Street
Blind River Ontario P0R 1B0
(705) 356-1666 Extn: 231

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Huron Shores Family Health Team
527 Causley Street
P.O. Box 1450
Blind River Ontario P0R 1B0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 356-1666
Extension: 251
Fax: (705) 356-2403

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 04 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Shore Health Network Blind River
HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Naccarato Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Naccarato (CPSO#: 103014 )
Business Address: P.O. Box 970
525 Causley Street
Blind River Ontario P0R 1B0
Business Address: Huron Shores Family Health Team
P.O. Box 1450
527 Causley Street
Blind River Ontario P0R 1B0
(705) 356-1666 Extn: 231

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW DOMINIC NACCARATO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NACCARATO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW DOMINIC NACCARATO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NACCARATO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014