THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:10:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 48 Hillside Dr
Noojmowin-Teg Health Centre
Little Current ON P0P 1K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-368-0083
Fax: 1-866-232-6160
Address: 161 Applegrove St
Shkagamik-kwe Health Centre
Sudbury Ontario P3C 1N2
Phone: (705) 675-1596
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jan 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Erin Peltier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 48 Hillside Dr
Noojmowin-Teg Health Centre
Little Current ON P0P 1K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-368-0083
Fax: 1-866-232-6160
Address: 161 Applegrove St
Shkagamik-kwe Health Centre
Sudbury Ontario P3C 1N2
Phone: (705) 675-1596
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jan 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Erin Peltier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIN RENEE PELTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELTIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIN RENEE PELTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELTIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014