THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:11:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 328 Highway 7
Suite 301
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 820 7171
Fax: 905 417 1133

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 03 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Eustace Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Eustace (CPSO#: 103035 )
Business Address: 102-3420 Major Mackenzie Dr
Woodbridge ON L4H 4J6
9058207171

Corporation Name: Gregory Eustace Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Feb 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 328 Highway 7
Suite 301
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 820 7171
Fax: 905 417 1133

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 03 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Eustace Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Eustace (CPSO#: 103035 )
Business Address: 102-3420 Major Mackenzie Dr
Woodbridge ON L4H 4J6
9058207171

Corporation Name: Gregory Eustace Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Feb 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY JAMES EUSTACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EUSTACE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY JAMES EUSTACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EUSTACE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2014