THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:30:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1450 Highway 2
Courtice Health Centre
Courtice ON L1E 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-721-4069
Fax: 905-721-6171
Address: 117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H1B9
Phone: 9057238551
Extension: 5222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre
LOCATION: Little Current

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Megan Gao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gao (CPSO#: 103043 )
Business Address: 501 Oakwood Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6E 2W8
Business Address: 117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 723-8551
Business Address: 1450 Highway 2
Courtice Health Centre
Courtice ON L1E 3C3
905-721-4069

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1450 Highway 2
Courtice Health Centre
Courtice ON L1E 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-721-4069
Fax: 905-721-6171
Address: 117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H1B9
Phone: 9057238551
Extension: 5222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre
LOCATION: Little Current

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Megan Gao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gao (CPSO#: 103043 )
Business Address: 501 Oakwood Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6E 2W8
Business Address: 117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 723-8551
Business Address: 1450 Highway 2
Courtice Health Centre
Courtice ON L1E 3C3
905-721-4069

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGAN JIEOU GAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGAN JIEOU GAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014