THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:01:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Hematology
Level 1, Room 270A
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 46139
Fax: (905) 577-1421
Address: St Joseph's Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Juravinski Hospital,
Department of Internal Medicine
711 Concession
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 389-4411
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1200 Main St West
Hematology / 3F Clinic
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 15 Nov 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SARAH PATTERSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Patterson (CPSO#: 103048 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
A1-270
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Hematology
Level 1, Room 270A
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 46139
Fax: (905) 577-1421
Address: St Joseph's Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Juravinski Hospital,
Department of Internal Medicine
711 Concession
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 389-4411
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1200 Main St West
Hematology / 3F Clinic
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 15 Nov 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SARAH PATTERSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Patterson (CPSO#: 103048 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
A1-270
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH BENGER PATTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTERSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH BENGER PATTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTERSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014