THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:22:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: Ferrara, Sarah Ruth Lena (Used Until: 14 Jun 2020)
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
MG-406
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-5956
Fax: 416-480-6934

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S Neu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Neu (CPSO#: 103053 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
MG-501
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
416-480-5956

General Information

Former Name: Ferrara, Sarah Ruth Lena (Used Until: 14 Jun 2020)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
MG-406
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-5956
Fax: 416-480-6934

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S Neu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Neu (CPSO#: 103053 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
MG-501
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
416-480-5956

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH RUTH LENA NEU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH RUTH LENA NEU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014