THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:25:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 125 Lakeview Ave
Kingston ON K7M 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 384-4664
Fax: 613-384-4182

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 10 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Badowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Badowski (CPSO#: 103068 )
Business Address: 125 Lakeview Ave
Kingston ON K7M 3T6
Business Address: Quinte Health Care
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-7400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 125 Lakeview Ave
Kingston ON K7M 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 384-4664
Fax: 613-384-4182

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 10 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Badowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Badowski (CPSO#: 103068 )
Business Address: 125 Lakeview Ave
Kingston ON K7M 3T6
Business Address: Quinte Health Care
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-7400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCIN BADOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADOWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCIN BADOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 May 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014