THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:42:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wellesley – St. James Health Centre
95 Homewood Ave
Toronto ON M4Y 2K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-3096
Fax: 416-864-6035

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erin Lurie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lurie (CPSO#: 103069 )
Business Address: St James Town Health Centre
1st Floor
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1K2
(416) 864-3096

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wellesley – St. James Health Centre
95 Homewood Ave
Toronto ON M4Y 2K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-3096
Fax: 416-864-6035

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erin Lurie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lurie (CPSO#: 103069 )
Business Address: St James Town Health Centre
1st Floor
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1K2
(416) 864-3096

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIN MICHELLE LURIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LURIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIN MICHELLE LURIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LURIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014