THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:56:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
115 Delhi St
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 10 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Fregeau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Fregeau (CPSO#: 103070 )
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
115 Delhi St
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 10 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Fregeau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Fregeau (CPSO#: 103070 )
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN MICHAEL FREGEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREGEAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN MICHAEL FREGEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREGEAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014