THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:22:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Department of Internal Medicine
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 28 Jul 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ANTHONY CAMPBELL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Campbell (CPSO#: 103075 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Department of Internal Medicine
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 28 Jul 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ANTHONY CAMPBELL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Campbell (CPSO#: 103075 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY BLAKE CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY BLAKE CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014