THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:42:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 134
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor, Ontario, N8X 3V6
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 946-3303
Fax: (519) 946-0285
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor, ON
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Aug 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Nhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Nhan (CPSO#: 103108 )
Business Address: 2462 Howard Avenue
Suite 134
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 946-3303

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 134
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor, Ontario, N8X 3V6
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 946-3303
Fax: (519) 946-0285
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor, ON
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Aug 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Nhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Nhan (CPSO#: 103108 )
Business Address: 2462 Howard Avenue
Suite 134
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 946-3303

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN RICHARD NHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN RICHARD NHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014