THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 23:31:20 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Respirology
1609-4
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165864800
Extension: 2436
Fax: 416-646-1062
Address: Toronto Grace Health Sciences Centre
1st Floor
650 Church St
Toronto ON M4Y 2G5
Phone: 416-925-2251
Extension: 265
Fax: 647-689-3554
Address: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Respirology
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 2436
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Blazer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Blazer (CPSO#: 103109 )
Business Address: 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Respirology
1609-4
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165864800
Extension: 2436
Fax: 416-646-1062
Address: Toronto Grace Health Sciences Centre
1st Floor
650 Church St
Toronto ON M4Y 2G5
Phone: 416-925-2251
Extension: 265
Fax: 647-689-3554
Address: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Respirology
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 2436
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Blazer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Blazer (CPSO#: 103109 )
Business Address: 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALINA JULIA BLAZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAZER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALINA JULIA BLAZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAZER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014