THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:31:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Owen Sound Family Health Team
1415 1st Ave. W, Suite 2000
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: 519-370-4054

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dale Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Edwards (CPSO#: 103114 ) Dr. C. Travers (CPSO#: 105914 )
Business Address: 1415 1st Avenue West
Suite 2000
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
Business Address: Grey-Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Owen Sound Family Health Team
1415 1st Ave. W, Suite 2000
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: 519-370-4054

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dale Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Edwards (CPSO#: 103114 ) Dr. C. Travers (CPSO#: 105914 )
Business Address: 1415 1st Avenue West
Suite 2000
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
Business Address: Grey-Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALE ROBIN EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALE ROBIN EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014