THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:36:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 134
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 946-0147
Fax: (519) 946-1269
Address: Hotel-Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Rd
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
Phone: (519) 257-5111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan Mills Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mills (CPSO#: 103115 )
Business Address: 1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 257-5111
Business Address: 2462 Howard Avenue
Suite 134
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 946-0147

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 134
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 946-0147
Fax: (519) 946-1269
Address: Hotel-Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Rd
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
Phone: (519) 257-5111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan Mills Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mills (CPSO#: 103115 )
Business Address: 1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 257-5111
Business Address: 2462 Howard Avenue
Suite 134
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 946-0147

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN WAYNE MILLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN WAYNE MILLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014