THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:28:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 155 Main St E, Suite 100
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059455476
Fax: 9059457707
Address: 163 Main St E
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Grimsby Ontario L3M1P3
Phone: 9059452253
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1112 St Andrew's Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Phone: 705-526-1300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Margeson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Margeson (CPSO#: 103116 )
Business Address: 169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
(905) 945-2253
Business Address: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrew's Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
(705) 526-1300
Business Address: 100 - 155 Main Street East
Lower Level
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P2
(905) 945-5476

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 155 Main St E, Suite 100
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059455476
Fax: 9059457707
Address: 163 Main St E
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Grimsby Ontario L3M1P3
Phone: 9059452253
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1112 St Andrew's Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Phone: 705-526-1300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Margeson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Margeson (CPSO#: 103116 )
Business Address: 169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
(905) 945-2253
Business Address: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrew's Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
(705) 526-1300
Business Address: 100 - 155 Main Street East
Lower Level
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P2
(905) 945-5476

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTA LYNN HORTON MARGESON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARGESON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTA LYNN HORTON MARGESON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARGESON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014