THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:53:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-272-8210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 04 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Seaforth Community Hospital
LOCATION: Seaforth

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil Rittenhouse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rittenhouse (CPSO#: 103123 )
Business Address: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-272-8210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 04 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Seaforth Community Hospital
LOCATION: Seaforth

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil Rittenhouse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rittenhouse (CPSO#: 103123 )
Business Address: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL ANDREW RITTENHOUSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RITTENHOUSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL ANDREW RITTENHOUSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RITTENHOUSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014