THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:19:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Critical Care
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
507 Smyth Road
Ottawa, ON K1H 8M2
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shannon Fernando Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fernando (CPSO#: 103150 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Critical Care
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
507 Smyth Road
Ottawa, ON K1H 8M2
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shannon Fernando Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fernando (CPSO#: 103150 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANNON MARIO FERNANDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANNON MARIO FERNANDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Feb 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014