THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:12:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
North Tower Room B8 045
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 75657
Fax: 519-685-8595

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 08 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Gregory MPC
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gregory (CPSO#: 103159 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
B8-159
London Ontario N6A 5W9
5196858500 Extn: 75657

Corporation Name: JONATHAN GREGORY Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Dec 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
North Tower Room B8 045
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 75657
Fax: 519-685-8595

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 08 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Gregory MPC
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gregory (CPSO#: 103159 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
B8-159
London Ontario N6A 5W9
5196858500 Extn: 75657

Corporation Name: JONATHAN GREGORY Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Dec 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN MICHAEL GREGORY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREGORY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN MICHAEL GREGORY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREGORY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014