THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:44:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-200 Main St E
Kingsville ON N9Y 1A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-216-3292
Fax: 226-216-3293
Address: Erie Shores HealthCare
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Phone: 519-326-2373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Apr 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 04 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexis Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Taylor (CPSO#: 103172 )
Business Address: Leamington and Area Family Health Team
10-59 Main Street East
Kingsville Ontario N9Y 1A1
(519) 322-1100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-200 Main St E
Kingsville ON N9Y 1A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-216-3292
Fax: 226-216-3293
Address: Erie Shores HealthCare
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Phone: 519-326-2373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Apr 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 04 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexis Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Taylor (CPSO#: 103172 )
Business Address: Leamington and Area Family Health Team
10-59 Main Street East
Kingsville Ontario N9Y 1A1
(519) 322-1100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXIS TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXIS TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014