THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:21:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South Walkerville Medical Centre
129 - 2224 Walker Rd
Windsor ON N8W 5L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-916-2417
Fax: 519-916-2418

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Vandereerden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vandereerden (CPSO#: 103175 )
Business Address: Suite 121
2224 Walker Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 5L7
(519) 252-4994
Business Address: 129-2224 Walker Rd
Windsor ON N8W 5L7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South Walkerville Medical Centre
129 - 2224 Walker Rd
Windsor ON N8W 5L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-916-2417
Fax: 519-916-2418

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Vandereerden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vandereerden (CPSO#: 103175 )
Business Address: Suite 121
2224 Walker Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 5L7
(519) 252-4994
Business Address: 129-2224 Walker Rd
Windsor ON N8W 5L7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACKIE LYNN VANDEREERDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDEREERDEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACKIE LYNN VANDEREERDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDEREERDEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014