THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:29:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Grosvenor Street Room B0-697
St. Joseph's Health Care London
London ON N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Extension: 66145
Fax: (519) 646-6119

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 29 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ANURAG BHALLA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bhalla (CPSO#: 103177 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
St. Joseph’s Health Care London
Room B4-056
London Ontario N6A 3N3
(519) 646-6100 Extn: 66145

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Grosvenor Street Room B0-697
St. Joseph's Health Care London
London ON N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Extension: 66145
Fax: (519) 646-6119

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 29 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ANURAG BHALLA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bhalla (CPSO#: 103177 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
St. Joseph’s Health Care London
Room B4-056
London Ontario N6A 3N3
(519) 646-6100 Extn: 66145

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANURAG BHALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHALLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANURAG BHALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHALLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014