THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:30:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 757
300-450 Whites Road
Palmerston Ontario N0G 2P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 343-3831
Fax: (519) 343-9944

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
HOSPITAL: Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp
LOCATION: Palmerston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tamara Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chu (CPSO#: 103183 )
Business Address: 450 Whites Road
Suite 300
Palmerston Ontario N0G 2P0
(519) 343-3831
Business Address: 500 Whites Road
Palmerston Ontario N0G 2P0
(519) 343-2030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 757
300-450 Whites Road
Palmerston Ontario N0G 2P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 343-3831
Fax: (519) 343-9944

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
HOSPITAL: Palmerston & District Site North Wellington Health Care Corp
LOCATION: Palmerston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tamara Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chu (CPSO#: 103183 )
Business Address: 450 Whites Road
Suite 300
Palmerston Ontario N0G 2P0
(519) 343-3831
Business Address: 500 Whites Road
Palmerston Ontario N0G 2P0
(519) 343-2030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAMARA TRACY CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAMARA TRACY CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014