THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:06:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: the arva clinic
14351 Medway Road
Arva Ontario N0M 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 672 9063
Fax: 519 672 9439

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carly Hewson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hewson (CPSO#: 103190 )
Business Address: 14351 Medway Road
Arva ON N0M 1C0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: the arva clinic
14351 Medway Road
Arva Ontario N0M 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 672 9063
Fax: 519 672 9439

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carly Hewson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hewson (CPSO#: 103190 )
Business Address: 14351 Medway Road
Arva ON N0M 1C0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARLY JENNIFER HEWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEWSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARLY JENNIFER HEWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEWSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014