THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:44:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8141
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8141
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL BYRNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BYRNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL BYRNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BYRNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014