THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: 4168000354
Address: 284 Queen Street East
Unit 219
Brampton Ontario L6V 1C2
Phone: 4166139335
Fax: 4168000354

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Troy Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ng (CPSO#: 103199 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
William Osler Health System
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
9054942120
Business Address: 48-2140 North Park Dr
Brampton ON L6S 0C9
4166139335

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: 4168000354
Address: 284 Queen Street East
Unit 219
Brampton Ontario L6V 1C2
Phone: 4166139335
Fax: 4168000354

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Troy Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ng (CPSO#: 103199 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
William Osler Health System
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
9054942120
Business Address: 48-2140 North Park Dr
Brampton ON L6S 0C9
4166139335

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TROY ANDREW NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TROY ANDREW NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014