THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:34:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hillside Medical Clinic
520 Ellesmere Road
Unit 403
Scarborough Ontario M1R0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-261-7223
Fax: 416-261-6374

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nisanthini Ravichandiran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ravichandiran (CPSO#: 103202 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hillside Medical Clinic
520 Ellesmere Road
Unit 403
Scarborough Ontario M1R0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-261-7223
Fax: 416-261-6374

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nisanthini Ravichandiran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ravichandiran (CPSO#: 103202 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NISANTHINI RAVICHANDIRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVICHANDIRAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NISANTHINI RAVICHANDIRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVICHANDIRAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014