THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:57:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)279-1990
Fax: (519)895-1623

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sabrina Lue Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lue (CPSO#: 103214 )
Business Address: 208-435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2J 3Z4

Corporation Name: SABRINA LUE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Aug 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)279-1990
Fax: (519)895-1623

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sabrina Lue Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lue (CPSO#: 103214 )
Business Address: 208-435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2J 3Z4

Corporation Name: SABRINA LUE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Aug 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SABRINA RACHELLE LUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SABRINA RACHELLE LUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014