THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:27:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 Wellington Rd
Parkwood Institute
Division of Geriatric Medicine
London ON N6C 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Fax: (519) 685-4093

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 08 Mar 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachel Kyle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kyle (CPSO#: 103217 )
Business Address: 550 Wellington Rd
London ON N6C 0A7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 Wellington Rd
Parkwood Institute
Division of Geriatric Medicine
London ON N6C 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Fax: (519) 685-4093

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 08 Mar 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachel Kyle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kyle (CPSO#: 103217 )
Business Address: 550 Wellington Rd
London ON N6C 0A7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL MARIE ALLEN KYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KYLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL MARIE ALLEN KYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KYLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014