THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:23:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 312
460 Springbank Drive
London Ontario N6J 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 963-3780
Fax: 5199633778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Shewfelt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Shewfelt (CPSO#: 103232 )
Business Address: 460 Springbank Drive
Suite 312
London Ontario N6J 0A8
(519) 963-3780

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 312
460 Springbank Drive
London Ontario N6J 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 963-3780
Fax: 5199633778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Shewfelt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Shewfelt (CPSO#: 103232 )
Business Address: 460 Springbank Drive
Suite 312
London Ontario N6J 0A8
(519) 963-3780

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEVON JOHN SHEWFELT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEWFELT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEVON JOHN SHEWFELT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEWFELT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014