THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:50:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Guyana, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 - 614 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 624-9169
Fax: 519-623-7342

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cameila R. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Singh (CPSO#: 103237 )
Business Address: 201 - 614 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3E8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Guyana, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 - 614 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 624-9169
Fax: 519-623-7342

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cameila R. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Singh (CPSO#: 103237 )
Business Address: 201 - 614 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3E8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMEILA RAJINNIE SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMEILA RAJINNIE SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Guyana, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014