THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:02:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Peradeniya, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-294 Talbot St
Talbot Family Health Organization
St Thomas ON N5P 4E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-210-3773
Fax: 519-914-0122

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anusha Perera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Perera (CPSO#: 103246 )
Business Address: 25 Elm Street
Suite 104
St Thomas Ontario N5R 1H5
(226) 210-3773

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALA
Medical School: University of Peradeniya, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-294 Talbot St
Talbot Family Health Organization
St Thomas ON N5P 4E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-210-3773
Fax: 519-914-0122

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anusha Perera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Perera (CPSO#: 103246 )
Business Address: 25 Elm Street
Suite 104
St Thomas Ontario N5R 1H5
(226) 210-3773

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMBALANGODA GURUNNANSELAGE ANUSHA RENU PERERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERERA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMBALANGODA GURUNNANSELAGE ANUSHA RENU PERERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERERA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Peradeniya, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014