THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:46:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peter George Centre for Living and
Learning, 1280 Main St W
Hamilton
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1100 Dundas St W
Unit #6
Canadian Rapid Treatment Centre of Excellence
Mississauga ON L5C 4E7
Phone: (416) 430-9619
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
Phone: 416-603-2581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Geneva Weiglein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Weiglein (CPSO#: 103249 )
Business Address: 1182 North Shore Boulevard
Lower Level - B12
Burlington Ontario L7S 1C5
(905) 632-3737 Extn: 3416
Business Address: 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8
(905) 525-9140
Business Address: 1100 Dundas Street West
Suite 6
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4E7
(416) 943-6284

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peter George Centre for Living and
Learning, 1280 Main St W
Hamilton
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1100 Dundas St W
Unit #6
Canadian Rapid Treatment Centre of Excellence
Mississauga ON L5C 4E7
Phone: (416) 430-9619
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
Phone: 416-603-2581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Geneva Weiglein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Weiglein (CPSO#: 103249 )
Business Address: 1182 North Shore Boulevard
Lower Level - B12
Burlington Ontario L7S 1C5
(905) 632-3737 Extn: 3416
Business Address: 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8
(905) 525-9140
Business Address: 1100 Dundas Street West
Suite 6
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4E7
(416) 943-6284

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GENEVA MARY ELISABETH WEIGLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEIGLEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GENEVA MARY ELISABETH WEIGLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEIGLEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014