THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:41:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3550 Schmon Pky
Unit 5
Thorold ON L2V 4Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-688-8118
Fax: 905-378-3039

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SABRINA YOUASH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Youash (CPSO#: 103259 )
Business Address: 3550 Schmon Pky
Unit #5
Thorold ON L2V 4Y6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3550 Schmon Pky
Unit 5
Thorold ON L2V 4Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-688-8118
Fax: 905-378-3039

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SABRINA YOUASH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Youash (CPSO#: 103259 )
Business Address: 3550 Schmon Pky
Unit #5
Thorold ON L2V 4Y6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SABRINA MARIAM YOUASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUASH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SABRINA MARIAM YOUASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUASH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014