THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:25:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Murray Street
Mt. Sinai Hospital
Division of Family Medicine
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON
M5G 1X5
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.A. Osborne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Osborne (CPSO#: 103265 )
Business Address: 60 Murray Street
4th floor
Toronto ON M5T3L9
4165863175
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W - Suite 2578
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
9058131100
Business Address: 60 Murray Street
4th floor
Toronto ON M5T3L9
4165863175

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Murray Street
Mt. Sinai Hospital
Division of Family Medicine
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON
M5G 1X5
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.A. Osborne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Osborne (CPSO#: 103265 )
Business Address: 60 Murray Street
4th floor
Toronto ON M5T3L9
4165863175
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W - Suite 2578
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
9058131100
Business Address: 60 Murray Street
4th floor
Toronto ON M5T3L9
4165863175

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD ANDREW OSBORNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSBORNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD ANDREW OSBORNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSBORNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014