THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:32:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 51 Benton St
Kitchener Ontario N2G 3H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-476-0459
Fax: 226-215-3193
Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King St W
Kitchener, ON
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: 519-749-4300
Fax: 519-749-4206

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mallory Fox Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fox (CPSO#: 103272 )
Business Address: 51 Benton Street
Kitchener Ontario N2G 3H1
(226) 476-0459

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 51 Benton St
Kitchener Ontario N2G 3H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-476-0459
Fax: 226-215-3193
Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King St W
Kitchener, ON
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: 519-749-4300
Fax: 519-749-4206

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mallory Fox Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fox (CPSO#: 103272 )
Business Address: 51 Benton Street
Kitchener Ontario N2G 3H1
(226) 476-0459

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALLORY ELIZABETH FOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOX is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALLORY ELIZABETH FOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOX is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014