THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:46:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Parkdale Queen West CHC
1229 Queen St West
Toronto ON M6K 1L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-537-2455
Fax: 416-537-3526
Address: 333 Sherbourne St
Toronto Ontario M5A 2S5
Phone: 416-324-4100
Fax: 416-324-4181
Address: Casey House Hospice
119 Isabella St
Toronto ON M4Y 1P2
Phone: 416-962-7600
Fax: 416-929-8849

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Casey House Toronto
HOSPITAL: Casey House
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Maloney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Maloney (CPSO#: 103288 )
Business Address: 4008-2191 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 3H8

Corporation Name: Edward Maloney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 May 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Parkdale Queen West CHC
1229 Queen St West
Toronto ON M6K 1L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-537-2455
Fax: 416-537-3526
Address: 333 Sherbourne St
Toronto Ontario M5A 2S5
Phone: 416-324-4100
Fax: 416-324-4181
Address: Casey House Hospice
119 Isabella St
Toronto ON M4Y 1P2
Phone: 416-962-7600
Fax: 416-929-8849

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Casey House Toronto
HOSPITAL: Casey House
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Maloney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Maloney (CPSO#: 103288 )
Business Address: 4008-2191 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 3H8

Corporation Name: Edward Maloney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 May 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD THOMAS MALONEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALONEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD THOMAS MALONEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALONEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014