THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:24:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PERSIAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 415-1420 Burnhamthorpe Rd E
Mississauga Retina Institute
Mississauga ON L4X 2Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 232 7722
Fax: 905 232 0674

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arjmand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Arjmand (CPSO#: 103292 )
Business Address: 415-1420 Burnhamthorpe Rd E
Mississauga ON L4X 2Z9
(905) 232-7722

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PERSIAN, SPANISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 415-1420 Burnhamthorpe Rd E
Mississauga Retina Institute
Mississauga ON L4X 2Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 232 7722
Fax: 905 232 0674

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arjmand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Arjmand (CPSO#: 103292 )
Business Address: 415-1420 Burnhamthorpe Rd E
Mississauga ON L4X 2Z9
(905) 232-7722

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARNIAN ARJMAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARJMAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARNIAN ARJMAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARJMAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014