THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:21:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Evan Cole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Cole (CPSO#: 103294 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
905-848-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Evan Cole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Cole (CPSO#: 103294 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
905-848-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVAN TAYLOR COLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVAN TAYLOR COLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014